Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Davin, Keli Anne filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2012 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9445995 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-09-2023:12:48:29 |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes MOTION TO MODIFY 1/9/2023 - Transaction 9445989 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-09-2023:12:47:43 |
|
January 09, 2023 | Hearing |
H476 - MOTION TO MODIFY D355 - Denied filed on: 01/09/2023 Extra Text: JAVS - HEARING ROOM B CLERK - K. BRISTOL Judge: MASTER SHANNON |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9433343 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-30-2022:10:16:10 |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
3870 - Request Exhibits for the court hearing - Transaction 9433339 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-30-2022:10:15:34 |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
1457 - Confidential Document(s) notice of parties addresses(to remain confidential) - Transaction 9402575 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-09-2022:14:38:27 |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing Transaction 9402575 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-09-2022:14:38:27 |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9402581 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-09-2022:14:39:09 |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9371679 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-21-2022:07:29:33 |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Transaction 9371677 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-21-2022:07:28:52 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.