Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Banales, Master Aimee filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Aimee E. Banales presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryTp - Req Temporary Protective Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... APPL'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE GRANTED |
|
October 05, 2010 | Hearing |
H320 - HEARING ON EX PARTE FILING D435 - Heard ... filed on: 10/05/2010 Extra Text: EX PARTE DISSOLVE INTERVIEW.......NO RECORD/NO CLERK Judge: MASTER BANALES |
|
October 04, 2010 | Hearing |
EX1 - EX-PARTE MOTION EX200 - Ex Parte Motion Complete filed on: 10/05/2010 Extra Text: Judge: MASTER BANALES |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
1325 - ** Case Reopened Extra Text: |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 1757805 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-04-2010:15:16:49 |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
3897 - Return RETURNED COURT DOCUMENTS…RETURNED BY U. S. POSTAL SERVICE AS UNDELIVERABLE |
|
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... Extra Text: |
|
September 23, 2010 | Hearing |
EX1 - EX-PARTE MOTION EX200 - Ex Parte Motion Complete filed on: 09/23/2010 Extra Text: Judge: MASTER BANALES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.