Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Banales, Master Aimee filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Aimee E. Banales presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryTc - Tpo - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
1068 - Affidavit of Non-Service Extra Text: |
|
November 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... MODIFYING EPO |
|
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
1067 - Affidavit of Service Extra Text: |
|
June 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes RE 06/10/08 EXT HRG |
|
June 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
June 10, 2008 | Hearing |
H328 - EXTENDED HEARING - CHILDREN D828 - TPO Ord Extended filed on: 06/10/2008 Extra Text: APPL PRO PER; ADVP FTA EXTENDED 6 MONTH.........EXPIRES 12/10/08 @ 11:59 PM JAVS/CRT RM 4/GD Judge: MASTER BANALES |
|
June 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
1715 - Extended Protection Ord EXTENDED 6 MONTHS.................EXPIRES 12/10/08 @ 11:59 PM |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
2937 - Ord for Hrg to Ext/Mod/Dis TPO EXTENSION HEARING SET FOR 6-10-08 AT 8:30 AM |
|
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes MOTIONS WORKSHEET...COMPLETED BY MASTER AND CLERK UPON SUBMISSION AND REVIEW OF MOTION |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
1325 - ** Case Reopened Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.