Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barmettler, Dorlesa Andrea filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with SHANNON, MASTER GREG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 1192627 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-08-2009:10:38:56 |
|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
FCIS - Family Court Info Sheet Transaction 1192575 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-08-2009:10:36:10 |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Extra Text: |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
1987 - Mtn and Ord... Extra Text: |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
November 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
2420 - Mtn to Relocate MOTION A CHANGE IN GENERAL VISITATION SCHEDULE RELOCATION WITH TH CHILDREN JASON |
|
November 20, 2008 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 11/20/2008 Extra Text: Judge: CHUCK WELLER |
|
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
3359 - Ord Waiving Fees and Costs ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS JASON WARDROBE'S REQUEST TO WAIVE FEES AND COSTS IS GRANTED MAILED COPIES ON 11/26/08 nd |
|
November 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
3125 - Ord Issue Writ Habeas Corpus DOCUMENT NOT FOUND DURING QA - CVERA |
|
November 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: APPLICATION TO WAIVE FEES AND COSTS FILED 11-19-08 PARTY SUBMITTING: JASON WARDROBE DATE SUBMITTED: 11-19-08 SUBMITTED BY: RSIMPSON DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: 11/20/08--SENT TO JUDGE. AA. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.