Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Adams, Maureen C filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with SHANNON, MASTER GREG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
3780 - Release of Judgment Lien MAY 27, 2008 - Transaction 5266646 - Approved By: MFERNAND : 12-07-2015:14:58:21 |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5266855 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-07-2015:14:59:21 |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
3780 - Release of Judgment Lien MARCH 5, 2012 - Transaction 5266646 - Approved By: MFERNAND : 12-07-2015:14:58:21 |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
3780 - Release of Judgment Lien NOVEMBER 19, 2009 - Transaction 5266646 - Approved By: MFERNAND : 12-07-2015:14:58:21 |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
3780 - Release of Judgment Lien MAY 19, 2009 - Transaction 5266646 - Approved By: MFERNAND : 12-07-2015:14:58:21 |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
4300 - Withdrawal of Counsel SUSAN HALLAHAN, ESQ. & KARI LEPORI CORDISCO, ESQ. WITHDRAW - Transaction 5266646 - Approved By: MFERNAND : 12-07-2015:14:58:21 |
|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
2690 - Ord Affirming Master Recommend JUDGMENT AND ORDER AFFIRMING MASTER'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER - Transaction 5139143 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-14-2015:11:38:19 |
|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
F255 - Setld/Withdrn with Jud Conf/Hg Extra Text: |
|
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5139150 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-14-2015:11:39:11 |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5113401 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-26-2015:15:08:06 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.