Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ganz, Jenny Lynn filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with SHANNON, MASTER GREG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 2938292 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-08-2012:11:11:52 |
|
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord AND JUDGMENT AND ORDER AFFIRMING MASTER'S FINDINGS AND REC - Transaction 2938260 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-08-2012:11:06:05 |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
1940 - Master's Findings/Recommend Transaction 2892515 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-16-2012:16:04:08 |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 2892800 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-16-2012:16:45:01 |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 2892532 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-16-2012:16:06:41 |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes MOTION TO MODIFY 4/16/12 - Transaction 2892764 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-16-2012:16:41:21 |
|
April 16, 2012 | Hearing |
H476 - MOTION TO MODIFY D435 - Heard ... filed on: 04/16/2012 Extra Text: JAVS. RW Judge: MASTER SHANNON |
|
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
1370 - Certification Dist. Ct. Review Extra Text: |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing NOTICE OF HEARING AND MOTION TO MODIFY APRIL 16, 2012 @ 3:30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.