Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Baker, Esq., W. Kathleen filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with SHANNON, MASTER GREG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
3780 - Release of Judgment Lien Transaction 2325221 - Approved By: MPURDY : 07-05-2011:11:36:05 |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 2325424 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-05-2011:11:47:42 |
|
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Extra Text: |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
1845 - Judgment and Ord JUDGMENT AND ORDER |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
F220 - Decision With Hearing Extra Text: |
|
February 13, 2008 | Hearing |
H353 - FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY D435 - Heard ... filed on: 02/13/2008 Extra Text: JAVS. COURT #4. RA Judge: MASTER SHANNON |
|
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing FEB 13, 2008 @ 1:30 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
COV - **Civil Cover Sheet Extra Text: |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
2504 - Notice/Find/Finan/Prntl/Respon Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.