Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Banales, Master Aimee filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Aimee E. Banales presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryTc - Tpo - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
1696 - Hrg Exhibits Maintnd in File RE: 1/11/08 HEARING |
|
January 11, 2008 | Hearing |
H412 - HRG-ISSUE TPO CHILDREN D355 - Denied filed on: 01/11/2008 Extra Text: APP PRO PER; ADVP PRO PER; JAVS RM 4; MCA Judge: MASTER BANALES |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
F220 - Decision With Hearing Extra Text: |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
2700 - Ord After Hearing... APPLICATION DENIED |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes RE: 1/11/08 TPO HRG |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
1067 - Affidavit of Service Extra Text: |
|
January 02, 2008 | Hearing |
H412 - HRG-ISSUE TPO CHILDREN D450 - Heard-Continued Court filed on: 01/02/2008 Extra Text: CONTINUED TO 1-11-08 AT 10:00 AM JAVS/ S. STAMBOUGH CTRM # 1 Judge: . VACANT |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes HEARING TO ISSUE |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
2700 - Ord After Hearing... CONTINUING HEARING TO ISSUE TO 1-11-08 AT 10:00 AM |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
3385 - Personal Case Inf. UCCJEA Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.