Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cordisco, Esq., Kari L. filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with SHANNON, MASTER GREG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Extra Text: |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
2915 - Ord Dismissal w/o Prejudice MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
3780 - Release of Judgment Lien Extra Text: |
|
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Extra Text: |
|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
1555 - Default Judgment DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ORDER |
|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
F130 - Default Judgment Extra Text: |
|
January 14, 2008 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 01/22/2008 Extra Text: Judge: MASTER SHANNON |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
1037 - Affidavit of Default AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
COV - **Civil Cover Sheet Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.