Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Banales, Master Aimee filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Aimee E. Banales presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryTp - Req Temporary Protective Order |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
F220 - Decision With Hearing Extra Text: |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes RE: 1/11/08 EXT HRG |
|
January 11, 2008 | Hearing |
H416 - HRG-ISSUE TPO - NO CHILDREN D355 - Denied filed on: 01/11/2008 Extra Text: APP PRO PER; ADVP PRESENT WITH COUNSEL; JAVS RM 4; MCA Judge: MASTER BANALES |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
2700 - Ord After Hearing... .. APPLICATION DENIED |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
1067 - Affidavit of Service Extra Text: |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
1255 - Application for TPO Extra Text: |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
3242 - Ord Setting Hearing HRG TO ISSUE SET FOR 1-11-08 AT 10:00 AM |
|
December 27, 2007 | Hearing |
H320 - HEARING ON EX PARTE FILING D435 - Heard ... filed on: 12/27/2007 Extra Text: EX PARTE TPO INTERVIEW...HRG TO ISSUE SET...NO CLERK Judge: . VACANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.