Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Banales, Master Aimee filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Aimee E. Banales presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryTp - Req Temporary Protective Order |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
3060 - Ord Granting Mtn ... Transaction 3886025 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-29-2013:14:34:47 |
|
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
F250 - Setld/Withdrn w/o Jud Conf/Hrg Extra Text: |
|
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3886044 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-29-2013:14:37:28 |
|
July 26, 2013 | Hearing |
EX1 - EX-PARTE MOTION EX200 - Ex Parte Motion Complete filed on: 07/29/2013 Extra Text: Judge: MASTER BANALES |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
1325 - ** Case Reopened Extra Text: |
|
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3881148 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-26-2013:09:15:58 |
|
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
3897 - Return RETURNED COURT DOCUMENTS.......RETURNED BY U.S. POSTAL SERVICE AS UNDELIVERABLE |
|
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
3060 - Ord Granting Mtn ... Extra Text: |
|
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
1325 - ** Case Reopened Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.