Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Banales, Master Aimee filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Aimee E. Banales presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryTp - Req Temporary Protective Order |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2006 | Hearing |
H332 - EXTENDED HEARING - NO CHILDREN D845 - Vacated filed on: 01/27/2006 Extra Text: APP DISSOLVED TPO Judge: MASTER BANALES |
|
February 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
1067 - Affidavit of Service Extra Text: |
|
January 27, 2006 | Hearing |
H320 - HEARING ON EX PARTE FILING D435 - Heard ... filed on: 01/27/2006 Extra Text: EX PARTE TPO DISSOLVE INTERVIEW....NO CLERK Judge: . VACANT |
|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... GRANTING APP'S MOTION TO DISSOLVE |
|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
F215 - Decision Without Trial/Hearing Extra Text: |
|
January 26, 2006 | Hearing |
EX1 - EX-PARTE MOTION EX200 - Ex Parte Motion Complete filed on: 01/27/2006 Extra Text: Judge: MASTER BANALES |
|
January 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
1067 - Affidavit of Service TPO 12/29/05 |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
4165 - Temporary Protective Order TEMPORARY ORDER FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
2937 - Ord for Hrg to Ext/Mod/Dis TPO ORDER FOR HEARING TO EXTEND, MODIFY OR DISSOLVE THE PROTECTION ORDER. |
|
December 29, 2005 | Hearing |
H320 - HEARING ON EX PARTE FILING D425 - Granted filed on: 12/29/2005 Extra Text: TPO GRANTED. NO CLERK. RA Judge: MASTER GHUSN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.