Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hansen, Naoita Frances filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Sandra A. Unsworth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryJc - Joint Petition - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 6-18 HEARING CC - Transaction 7352812 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-02-2019:14:45:55 |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7352821 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-02-2019:14:47:18 |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
1392 - **Child Supp/Info Sheet Mailed Extra Text: |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
F255 - Setld/Withdrn with Jud Conf/Hg Extra Text: |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
1540 - Decree of Divorce Transaction 7328168 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-18-2019:15:44:44 |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7328178 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-18-2019:15:47:55 |
|
June 18, 2019 | Hearing |
H364 - HEARING... D425 - Granted filed on: 06/18/2019 Extra Text: CCOVINGTON/JAVS/DEPT. 12 COURT SIGNED DECREE. Judge: SANDRA UNSWORTH |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7289848 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-28-2019:10:32:04 |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
3242 - Ord Setting Hearing CONTINUING HEARING 6-18-2019 AT 1:30PM - Transaction 7289845 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-28-2019:10:31:01 |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7249476 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-02-2019:11:03:57 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.