Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sim, Xian Liang, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hanson Sim, Emily, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Sandra A. Unsworth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryDc - Divorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 | Hearing |
H492 - MOTION MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT D355 - Denied filed on: 10/28/2021 Extra Text: CLERK RBRANUM / NO JAVS / COURT REPORTER J. SCHONLAU - SUNSHINE REPORTING COURT TO PREPARE ORDER DENYING MR. SIM'S MOTION TO MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT Judge: SANDRA UNSWORTH |
|
October 28, 2021 | Hearing |
H492 - MOTION MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: SANDRA UNSWORTH |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8708592 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-20-2021:15:43:20 |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
1740 - Financial Declaration ... emily sim Transaction 8708589 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-20-2021:15:42:20 |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
1740 - Financial Declaration ... Transaction 8700671 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-15-2021:14:17:00 |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8700675 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-15-2021:14:17:48 |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
2700 - Ord After Hearing... ORDER AFTER STATUS HEARING - Transaction 8697207 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-14-2021:09:20:39 |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8697212 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-14-2021:09:21:39 |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 10-11 STATUS HEARING RB - Transaction 8692056 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-12-2021:07:56:18 |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8692061 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-12-2021:07:57:19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.