Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Cynthia Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
CategoryFd - Foreign Decree - Dv |
Last RefreshedAugust 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2023 | Hearing |
JVDM - Family Services Mediation - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: CYNTHIA LU |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9800007 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-28-2023:08:54:21 |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... NOTICE OF MEDIATION BY AUDIO VISUAL MEANS - Transaction 9800006 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-28-2023:08:53:51 |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of -$300.00 was made on receipt DCDC721903. |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
1740 - Financial Declaration ... Transaction 9753815 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-03-2023:11:55:51 |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
3720 - Proof of Service Transaction 9753815 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-03-2023:11:55:51 |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9753825 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-03-2023:11:56:45 |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9746790 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-28-2023:14:41:12 |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | $1725 - $**Family Mediation Fee Assess | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
3174 - Ord re Family Mediation Prog ORDER SETTING MEDIATION - Transaction 9746777 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-28-2023:14:39:41 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.