Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grossman, Dixie filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wade, Stacy, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Dixie R. Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2015 |
CategoryDc - Divorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6538665 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-20-2018:08:44:54 |
|
February 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
3897 - Return RETURNED MAIL - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER - STACY WADE - Transaction 6538280 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 02-20-2018:08:41:29 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6500385 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-26-2018:09:30:15 |
|
January 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Transaction 6500377 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-26-2018:09:29:14 |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
2700 - Ord After Hearing... ORDER AFTER HEARING REGARDING MOTION TO MODIFY CUSTODY AND RELOCATION - Transaction 6201511 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-18-2017:13:43:53 |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6201517 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-18-2017:13:44:49 |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6149016 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-14-2017:14:54:21 |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
1696 - Hrg Exhibits Maintnd in File 06/06/17 MOTION TO RELOCATE AND MODIFY CUSTODY - Transaction 6149013 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-14-2017:14:53:29 |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 6144575 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-12-2017:15:24:04 |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 06/06/17 MOTION TO RELOCATE AND MODIFY CUSTODY - Transaction 6144571 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-12-2017:15:23:04 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.