Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pereda, Jannette, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Becerra, Jr., Jose Dolores, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Sandra A. Unsworth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryDc - Divorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
F240 - Involuntary Dismissal Extra Text: |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4679640 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-04-2014:08:23:28 |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
2900 - Ord for Dismissal of Case Transaction 4679633 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-04-2014:08:22:33 |
|
September 15, 2014 | Hearing |
H364 - HEARING... D384 - Dismissed Family filed on: 09/15/2014 Extra Text: parties failed to appear; court to prepare order Judge: SANDRA UNSWORTH |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
3242 - Ord Setting Hearing Transaction 4567456 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-19-2014:11:03:18 |
|
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4567470 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-19-2014:11:04:51 |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
1550 - Default Extra Text: |
|
July 30, 2014 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 08/14/2014 Extra Text: Judge: SANDRA UNSWORTH |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
1520 - Declaration DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT |
|
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
FIE - **Document Filed in Error DOCUMENT TITLE: DEFAULT PARTY SUBMITTING: JANNETTE BECCERRA DATE SUBMITTED: 7/30/2014 SUBMITTED BY: APOMA DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.