Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grossman, Dixie filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Dixie R. Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryJc - Joint Petition - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7699734 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-23-2020:09:14:11 |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
F230 - Other Manner of Disposition Extra Text: |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
3170 - Ord Quash Bench Warrant Transaction 7699721 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-23-2020:09:12:33 |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
1301 - Bench Warrant Filed -Case Open CORRECTED BENCH WARRANT TO COMPLY WITH NEW PROCEDURE |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
F230 - Other Manner of Disposition Extra Text: |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 02/19/13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Transaction 3538163 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-19-2013:09:25:42 |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
1301 - Bench Warrant Filed -Case Open Extra Text: |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3538174 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-19-2013:09:27:16 |
|
February 19, 2013 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D435 - Heard ... filed on: 02/19/2013 Extra Text: BENCH WARRANT ISSUED. mb.cd.crtrm4 Judge: DIXIE GROSSMAN |
|
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3436049 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-02-2013:08:17:38 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.