Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kyer, Jack, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kyer, Tracy, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Bridget E. Robb presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryDc - Divorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
F250 - Setld/Withdrn w/o Jud Conf/Hrg Extra Text: |
|
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3805256 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-21-2013:10:43:35 |
|
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
2842 - Ord Denying Motion ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SOLE LEGAL CUSTODY - Transaction 3805244 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-21-2013:10:40:36 |
|
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
3790 - Reply to/in Opposition Extra Text: |
|
June 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
3720 - Proof of Service Extra Text: |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: MOTION FOR SOLE LEGAL CUSTODY (PAPER ORDER NOT PROVIDED) PARTY SUBMITTING: JACK KYER DATE SUBMITTED: 06-04-13 SUBMITTED BY: MLAWRENCE DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
3720 - Proof of Service Extra Text: |
|
June 04, 2013 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 06/21/2013 Extra Text: ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SOLE LEGAL CUSTODY Judge: BRIDGET ROBB |
|
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
1325 - ** Case Reopened Extra Text: |
|
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt DCDC410277. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.