Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grossman, Dixie filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Dixie R. Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryJn - Joint Petition - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 1798911 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-21-2010:15:19:31 |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
FCIS - Family Court Info Sheet Transaction 1798799 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-21-2010:15:11:45 |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
1540 - Decree of Divorce SUMMARY DIVORCE DECREE DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS AND DEBTS AS SET FORTH IN JOINT PETITION IS APPROVED AND RATIFIED BY COURT WIFE IS RESTORED TO HER FORMER NAME OF: MICHELLE LYNNE HICKS nd |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
F215 - Decision Without Trial/Hearing DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: JOINT PETITION AND ALL RELATED DOCUMENTS FILED PARTY SUBMITTING: JOINT PETITIONERS DATE SUBMITTED: 01/18/08 SUBMITTED BY: J. NORVICK DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
1650 - Errata... ERRATA TO JOINT PETITION FOR SUMMARY DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
January 18, 2008 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 01/22/2008 Extra Text: DECREE OF DIVORCE Judge: DIXIE GROSSMAN |
|
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
3250 - Ord Striking ... ORDER STRIKING REQUEST FOR SUBMISSION |
|
January 02, 2008 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 01/14/2008 Extra Text: ORDER STRIKING REQUEST FOR SUBMISSION Judge: DIXIE GROSSMAN |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of -$160.00 was made on receipt DCFC67346. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.