Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Newman (Tn), Kerby Earl filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Chuck Weller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChuck Weller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryJn - Joint Petition - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
2590 - Notice Withdrawal of Attorney WITHDRAWAL OF NICHOLUS PALMER FOR JOLEE NEWMAN |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
1540 - Decree of Divorce SUMMARY DIVORCE DECREE DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS AND DEBTS AS SET FORTH IN MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS APPROVED AND RATIFIED BY COURT |
|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
F215 - Decision Without Trial/Hearing Extra Text: |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of -$160.00 was made on receipt DCFC51684. |
|
January 02, 2007 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 01/08/2007 Extra Text: Counsel called to pick up order. File sent to docket clerk for processing. mt Judge: CHUCK WELLER |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
FCIS - Family Court Info Sheet Extra Text: |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
$1841 - $Joint Pet Sum Div-No Child Extra Text: |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DECREE SUBMITTED TO D-11 ON 01/02/07 mp RECEIVED IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS 1-3-07, FORWARDED TO LAW CLERK. |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
1065 - Affidavit of Resident Witness Extra Text: |
|
December 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
COV - **Civil Cover Sheet Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.