Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grossman, Dixie filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cortes, Ricardo, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Dixie R. Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDixie R. Grossman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2006 |
CategoryDo - Divorce - Without Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
4300 - Withdrawal of Counsel WITHDRAWAL OF BRUCE D. VOORHEES FOR RICARDO CORTES |
|
May 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Extra Text: |
|
May 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
1392 - **Child Supp/Info Sheet Mailed Extra Text: |
|
May 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
F220 - Decision With Hearing FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
May 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
1540 - Decree of Divorce DECREE OF DIVORCE DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS AND DEBTS AS SET FORTH IN FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND DECREE OF DIVORCE IS APPROVED AND RATIFIED BY COURT WIFE IS RESTORED TO HER FORMER NAME OF: ADELINA DUARTE cg |
|
May 10, 2007 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 05/28/2007 Extra Text: FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND DECRREE OF DIVORCE Judge: DIXIE GROSSMAN |
|
May 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND DECREE OF DIVORCE PARTY SUBMITTING: BRUCE VOORHEES DATE SUBMITTED: 05-10-07 SUBMITTED BY: C GALINDO DATE RECEIVED JUDGE'S OFFICE: |
|
March 13, 2007 | Hearing |
H185 - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE D435 - Heard ... filed on: 03/13/2007 Extra Text: INTERLOCUTORY DECREE OF DIVORCE ENTERED, PENDING RESOLUTION OF MARITAL RESIDENCE ISSUES. COUNSEL VOORHEES TO PREPARE DECREE. nm/cd Judge: CHARLES MCGEE |
|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes Extra Text: |
|
March 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... ORDER RESOLVING SUBMITTED MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.