Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Clunis, Michael L., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Clunis, Sandana D., in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Chuck Weller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryDo - Divorce - Without Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
1540 - Decree of Divorce DECREE OF DIVORCE WIFE IS RESTORED TO HER FORMER NAME OF: SANDANA CHAND |
|
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes Extra Text: |
|
April 07, 2006 | Hearing |
H200 - CONTESTED DIVORCE TRIAL D425 - Granted filed on: 04/07/2006 Extra Text: Decree of Divorce Granted. Clerk to prepare Decree Clerk M. Trimmer CD Record Judge: CHUCK WELLER |
|
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
F220 - Decision With Hearing Extra Text: |
|
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
1479 - **CMS Related Cases NO CMS RELATED FILES OR CONTEXTE RELATED FILES AS OF 3/27/2006 |
|
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
4085 - Summons Filed SERVICE - SANDANA CLUNIS 3/16/06 |
|
February 13, 2006 | Hearing |
H185 - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE D802 - Set in Error filed on: 02/10/2006 Extra Text: SET IN ERROR Judge: CHUCK WELLER |
|
February 10, 2006 | Hearing |
H185 - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE D435 - Heard ... filed on: 02/10/2006 Extra Text: NO CLERK NO RECORD TRIAL SET FOR 4/7/2006 AT 1:30 P.M. Judge: CHUCK WELLER |
|
February 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
3242 - Ord Setting Hearing APRIL 7, 2006 AT 1:30 P.M. |
|
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
2840 - Ord Denying ... ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ixf |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.