Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lane, Jason, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lane, Kara, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Chuck Weller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryAn - Annulment |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
F215 - Decision Without Trial/Hearing Extra Text: |
|
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
1530 - Decree - Annulment of Marriage DECREE OF ANNULMENT |
|
April 19, 2006 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 04/20/2006 Extra Text: Judge: CHUCK WELLER |
|
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: THE DOCUMENTS IN THIS CASE PARTY SUBMITTING: JASON LANE DATE SUBMITTED: 04-19-06 SUBMITTED BY: S STINCHFIELD DATE RECEIVED JUDGE'S OFFICE: |
|
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
1550 - Default Extra Text: |
|
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
1030 - Affidavit in Support... OF DEFAULT ANNULMENT |
|
February 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
4085 - Summons Filed SERVICE - KARA LANE 1/2/06 |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
200 - **Entire File Imaged** 12/30/05 THROUGH 4/20/06 |
|
December 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
4090 - ** Summons Issued Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.