Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grossman, Dixie filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Dixie R. Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2005 |
CategoryJc - Joint Petition - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
1392 - **Child Supp/Info Sheet Mailed Extra Text: |
|
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
1540 - Decree of Divorce SUMMARY DIVORCE DECREE DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS AND DEBTS AS SET FORTH IN JOINT PETITION IS APPROVED AND RATIFIED BY COURT WIFE IS RESTORED TO HER FORMER NAME OF: LINDSEY MAY MARLOW |
|
March 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
F215 - Decision Without Trial/Hearing decree of divorce |
|
February 24, 2006 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 03/06/2006 Extra Text: decree of divorce Judge: DIXIE GROSSMAN |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: ADDENDUM TO JOINT PETITION AND PROPOSED DECREE PARTY SUBMITTING: JOINT PETITIONERS DATE SUBMITTED: 02-24-06 SUBMITTED BY: S STINCHFIELD DATE RECEIVED JUDGE'S OFFICE: |
|
February 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
1020 - Addendum TO JOINT PETITION |
|
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
3250 - Ord Striking ... ORDER STRIKING REQUEST FOR SUBMISSION if |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
1065 - Affidavit of Resident Witness Extra Text: |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
FCIS - Family Court Info Sheet Extra Text: |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DECREE OF DIVORCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.