Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marshall, Kathryn Louise filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Sandra A. Unsworth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryJn - Joint Petition - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2006 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission D802 - Set in Error filed on: 10/25/2006 Extra Text: Judge: SANDRA UNSWORTH |
|
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
1325 - ** Case Reopened Extra Text: |
|
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed set in error, wrong information on wrong case. this case was closed on 1/9/06 with decree being entered. file back to f/o. deb |
|
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
1540 - Decree of Divorce SUMMARY DIVORCE DECREE DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS AND DEBTS AS SET FORTH IN JOINT PETITION IS APPROVED AND RATIFIED BY COURT |
|
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
F215 - Decision Without Trial/Hearing Extra Text: |
|
January 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of -$160.00 was made on receipt DCFC36770. |
|
December 28, 2005 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 01/06/2006 Extra Text: Judge: SANDRA UNSWORTH |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
$1841 - $Joint Pet Sum Div-No Child Extra Text: |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
FCIS - Family Court Info Sheet Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.