Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gamboa, Esq., Theodore David filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Escalera, J Marcos, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryDc - Divorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
1040 - Affidavit of Mailing Extra Text: |
|
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
1540 - Decree of Divorce DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
1392 - **Child Supp/Info Sheet Mailed Extra Text: |
|
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
April 20, 2006 | Docket Event |
F215 - Decision Without Trial/Hearing Extra Text: |
|
April 11, 2006 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 04/20/2006 Extra Text: Judge: CHUCK WELLER |
|
April 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
April 10, 2006 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 04/20/2006 Extra Text: Judge: CHUCK WELLER |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: DEFAULT PARTY SUBMITTING: PETITIONERS DATE SUBMITTED: 04-10-06 SUBMITTED BY: S STINCHFIELD DATE RECEIVED JUDGE'S OFFICE: |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
1030 - Affidavit in Support... OF DEFAULT DIVORCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.