Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grossman, Dixie filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Guerrero, Joseph K. Leon, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Dixie R. Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryDc - Divorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... NOTICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
November 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
F215 - Decision Without Trial/Hearing NOTICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 25, 2006 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 11/01/2006 Extra Text: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND ORDER Judge: DIXIE GROSSMAN |
|
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND ORDER PARTY SUBMITTING: RODNEY SUMPTER, ESQ. DATE SUBMITTED: 10-25-06 SUBMITTED BY: S STINCHFIELD DATE RECEIVED JUDGE'S OFFICE: |
|
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
3330 - Ord to Proceed ... within 30 days |
|
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
3715 - Proof of Publication FIRST DAY 5/8/06 LAST DAY 5/30/06 |
|
June 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
4085 - Summons Filed MAILING |
|
May 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
2965 - Ord for Publication Extra Text: |
|
April 24, 2006 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 05/04/2006 Extra Text: order for publication Judge: DIXIE GROSSMAN |
|
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
1027 - Affidavit/Publication/Summons Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.