Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Grossman, Dixie filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pena, Eric Avelino, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Dixie R. Grossman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryDc - Divorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
4300 - Withdrawal of Counsel WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FOR RODNEY E. SUMPTER FOR JAIMEY PENA |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
1540 - Decree of Divorce DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
April 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
F215 - Decision Without Trial/Hearing decree of divorce |
|
March 31, 2006 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 04/10/2006 Extra Text: decree of divorce Judge: DIXIE GROSSMAN |
|
March 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
4085 - Summons Filed RETURN OF ORIGINAL SUMMONS - NO SERVICE AFF. OF PUB. ATTACHED |
|
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
3715 - Proof of Publication FIRST DAY 2/17/06 LAST DAY 3/10/06 |
|
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
1027 - Affidavit/Publication/Summons ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS ixf |
|
February 09, 2006 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 02/14/2006 Extra Text: order for publication Judge: DIXIE GROSSMAN |
|
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
1027 - Affidavit/Publication/Summons Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.