Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with SHANNON, MASTER GREG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHANNON, MASTER GREG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 22, 1995 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2021 | Hearing |
H476 - MOTION TO MODIFY - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: MASTER SHANNON |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8220689 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-28-2020:14:34:25 |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
3870 - Request EXHIBITS FOR THE COURT HEARING - Transaction 8220615 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 12-28-2020:14:33:21 |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing AND MOTION TO MODIFY 1/4/21 1530 Transaction 8156832 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-10-2020:15:54:40 |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8156842 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-10-2020:15:55:46 |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
2488 - Motion to Seal Document Notice of Parties' Addresses - Transaction 8156832 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-10-2020:15:54:40 |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Extra Text: |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 2523399 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-11-2011:09:38:44 |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes MOTION MODIFY 08/22/11 - Transaction 2523396 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-11-2011:09:37:31 |
|
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
1845 - Judgment and Ord JUDGMENT AND ORDER - Transaction 2482605 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-21-2011:09:44:22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.