Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) Gc - Other Civil Matters case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with David A. Hardy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2024 |
CategoryGc - Other Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... Notice to Interested Parties - Transaction 10215684 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-13-2024:14:41:00 Judge: DAVID HARDY |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10215693 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-13-2024:14:42:06 Judge: DAVID HARDY |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10202898 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-07-2024:08:37:30 Judge: DAVID HARDY |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
1100 - Amended Notice of Hearing Amended Notice of Hearing - Transaction 10202895 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-07-2024:08:36:49 Judge: DAVID HARDY |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10198657 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-05-2024:13:11:28 Judge: DAVID HARDY |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing 05/10/2024 3:00PM Notice of Hearing - Transaction 10198655 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-05-2024:13:10:46 Judge: DAVID HARDY |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10190370 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-29-2024:14:33:06 Judge: DAVID HARDY |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
3242 - Ord Setting Hearing MINUTE ORDER SETTING ZOOM STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT HEARING - Transaction 10190366 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-29-2024:14:32:36 Judge: DAVID HARDY |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
4105 - Supplemental ... Supplement to Petition - Transaction 10183635 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-27-2024:12:51:42 Judge: DAVID HARDY |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 10183636 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-27-2024:12:52:01 Judge: DAVID HARDY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.