Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Kathleen A. Sigurdson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen A. Sigurdson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2022 |
CategoryMw - Material Witness - Criminal |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
F230 - Other Manner of Disposition Extra Text: |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... Transaction 9523005 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-22-2023:15:23:47 |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9523008 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-22-2023:15:24:16 |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9518663 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-21-2023:09:52:28 |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
4050 - Stipulation ... Transaction 9518657 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-21-2023:09:51:44 |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
1015 - Acknowledgment of Receipt Transaction 9518657 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-21-2023:09:51:44 |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9511755 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-15-2023:12:33:27 |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
1372 - Certification ... of Judge - Transaction 9511740 - Approved By: MSALAZAR : 02-15-2023:12:32:46 |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
3645 - Petition ... to Secure Attendance of Out of State Witness - Transaction 9511740 - Approved By: MSALAZAR : 02-15-2023:12:32:46 |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
F230 - Other Manner of Disposition Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.