Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guss, Odell Reean, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.,, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Barry L. Breslow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryNo - Other Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2021 | Hearing |
H852 - TRIAL - JURY D845 - Vacated filed on: 06/22/2020 Extra Text: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT Judge: BARRY BRESLOW |
|
January 07, 2021 | Hearing |
H756 - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE D845 - Vacated filed on: 06/22/2020 Extra Text: REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT Judge: BARRY BRESLOW |
|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7827818 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-09-2020:08:20:52 |
|
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
2580 - Notice Removal Federal Court DFX: MISSING INDEX OF EXHIBITS; EXHIBITS PRESENTED INCORRECTLY Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Action to United States District Court - Transaction 7827701 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 04-09-2020:08:19:54 |
|
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
F230 - Other Manner of Disposition REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT |
|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7825484 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-07-2020:14:24:31 |
|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
1835 - Joint Case Conference Report Transaction 7825461 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-07-2020:14:21:47 |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7799126 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-18-2020:16:15:29 |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
1250E - Application for Setting eFile Transaction 7799124 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-18-2020:16:14:29 |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7795985 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-17-2020:11:36:04 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.