Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nv Energy,, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Attorney General'S Bureau Of Consumer Protection,, Federal Executive Agencies,, Nevada Gaming Group And Switch Ltd,, Newmont Usa Limited,, Northern Nevada Industrial Electricity Users,, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with WALKER, EGAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryAo - Other Judicial Review/Appeal |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
4185 - Transcript 1-14-2020 ORAL ARGUMENTS - Transaction 7966352 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-12-2020:19:47:02 |
|
July 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7966353 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-12-2020:19:47:52 |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7916356 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-09-2020:13:08:24 |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
4185 - Transcript HEARING - FEBRUARY 6, 2020 - Transaction 7916355 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-09-2020:13:07:34 |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
1188 - Supreme Court Receipt for Doc SUPREME COURT NO. 81154 / RECEIPT FOR DOCUMENTS - Transaction 7875109 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-13-2020:13:53:42 |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7875118 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-13-2020:13:54:43 |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
1188 - Supreme Court Receipt for Doc SUPREME COURT NO. 81154 / RECEIPT FOR DOCUMENTS - Transaction 7871881 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-12-2020:08:41:12 |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7871886 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-12-2020:08:42:11 |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
1310 - Case Appeal Statement CASE APPEAL STATEMENT - Transaction 7865988 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 05-07-2020:09:30:10 |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
1187 - **Supreme Court Case No. ... SUPREME COURT NO. 81154 - SIERRA PACIFIC POWER CO ET AL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.