Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Stephens & Edwards, Llp,, filed a(n) Gc - Other Civil Matters case against Edwards, Richard D., Knight, Newel B., Lord, Anna, Network Realty, Inc.,, Newmark-Stephens, Sandra, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Lynne K. Simons presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryGc - Other Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8060638 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-10-2020:09:49:33 |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
3005 - Ord Withdrawal of Counsel GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDAW AS COUNSEL - Transaction 8060631 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-10-2020:09:48:17 |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
2645 - Opposition to Mtn ... OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AND CONTESTATION TO FALSE AND INACCURATE ALLEGATIONS CONTAINED IN MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - Transaction 7937936 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 06-23-2020:09:07:44 |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7937997 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-23-2020:09:08:45 |
|
June 17, 2020 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 09/10/2020 Extra Text: ORDER Judge: LYNNE JONES |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7930387 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-17-2020:15:20:03 |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission Transaction 7930384 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-17-2020:15:19:02 DOCUMENT TITLE: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW PARTY SUBMITTING: CHARLES KOZAK, ESQ. DATE SUBMITTED: 6/17/20 SUBMITTED BY: NM DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY - Transaction 7897940 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 05-28-2020:15:49:14 |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 7898016 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-28-2020:15:50:23 |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
2490 - Motion ... MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - Transaction 7894700 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 05-27-2020:13:47:18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.