Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
National Default Servicing Corp.,, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Souza, Michael Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Lynne K. Simons presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryRo - Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
F120 - Stipulated Dismissal Extra Text: |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
2545 - Notice of Entry ... Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order for Disbursement of Interpleader Funds to Bunny L. Souza and Dismissal - Transaction 5465734 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-14-2016:09:53:43 |
|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5465738 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-14-2016:09:54:36 |
|
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5463072 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-13-2016:09:08:43 |
|
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
3980 - Stip and Order... FOR DISBURSEMENT OF INTERPLEADER FUNDS TO BUNNY SOUZA AND TO DISMISS - Transaction 5463069 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-13-2016:09:05:44 |
|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
3696 - Pre-Trial Order Transaction 5456271 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-07-2016:16:22:54 |
|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5456280 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-07-2016:16:25:58 |
|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
A120 - Exemption from Arbitration Transaction 5454543 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-07-2016:10:20:13 |
|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5454548 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-07-2016:10:21:15 |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
1550 - Default DEFT MICHAEL J. SOUZA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.