Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brohawn, Esq., Sean L. filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Mei-Gsr Holdings Llc Dba Grand Sierra Resort And Casino,, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategoryCi - Commercial Instrument |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5801036 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-10-2016:10:18:28 |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
3910 - Satisfaction of Judgment SATISFACTION OF ORDERS AND JUDGMENT - Transaction 5800897 - Approved By: RKWATKIN : 11-10-2016:10:17:42 |
|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
3910 - Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction of Orders and Judgment - Transaction 5793799 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 11-07-2016:15:32:32 |
|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5794971 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-07-2016:15:33:31 |
|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
CHECK - **Trust Disbursement A Disbursement of $500.00 on Check Number 30835 |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
2980 - Ord Return of Appeal Bond Transaction 5092549 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-13-2015:13:04:00 |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 5092556 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-13-2015:13:04:55 |
|
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
4127 - Supreme Ct Ord Dismis Appeal SUPREME COURT NO. 64923/ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL - Transaction 4997470 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-12-2015:10:43:19 |
|
June 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4997476 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-12-2015:10:44:18 |
|
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4946457 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-11-2015:10:51:28 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.