Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Morris, Esq., Christian filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against International House Of Pancakes,, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2012 |
CategorySf - Premises Liability |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
F100 - Voluntary Dismissals Extra Text: |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3829197 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-02-2013:11:24:16 |
|
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
2585 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Transaction 3828294 - Approved By: YLLOYD : 07-02-2013:11:19:05 |
|
March 19, 2013 | Docket Event | 4090 - ** Summons Issued | |
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 3589405 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-13-2013:15:23:59 |
|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
1090 - Amended Complaint FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - Transaction 3588923 - Approved By: APOMA : 03-13-2013:15:22:15 |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
4090 - ** Summons Issued Extra Text: |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of $260.00 was made on receipt DCDC389619. |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
$1425 - $Complaint - Civil Transaction 3429561 - Approved By: MLAWRENC : 12-27-2012:12:45:41 |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
1817 - Initial Appear. Fee Disclosure Transaction 3429561 - Approved By: MLAWRENC : 12-27-2012:12:45:41 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.