Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bernard, Esq., Lawrence B. filed a(n) Workers Compensation - Labor and Employment case against Imswiller, Lauri, Division Of Industrial Relations,, Nevada Dept. Of Administration, Appeals Office,, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategorySi - Worker'S Compensation |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeWorkers Compensation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes MINUTES - 9/19/08 - Transaction 452932 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-13-2008:13:32:57 |
|
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Extra Text: |
|
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
2685 - Ord Affirm/Judg/Dism/Remand REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS - Transaction 421051 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-21-2008:16:03:28 |
|
September 19, 2008 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 10/21/2008 Extra Text: Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
September 19, 2008 | Hearing |
H744 - PETITION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW D435 - Heard ... filed on: 09/19/2008 Extra Text: UNDER SUBMISSION Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
1250 - Application for Setting 09/19/08 AT 10:00 A.M. |
|
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
3242 - Ord Setting Hearing COUNSEL TO APPEAR WITHIN 15 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO SET ORAL ARGUMENTS ON THE PETITION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
June 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: PETITION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW PARTY SUBMITTING: LAWRENCE B BERNARD, ESQ DATE SUBMITTED: 06/09/08 SUBMITTED BY: DJ DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: 6/10/08 |
|
June 09, 2008 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 07/22/2008 Extra Text: Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.