Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Blanchard, Alan filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case against Mandalay Resort Group,, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Connie J. Steinheimer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConnie J. Steinheimer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2006 |
CategoryDf - Torts-Defamation (Libel/Sland) |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
CHECK - **Trust Disbursement A Disbursement of $320.00 on Check Number 28582 |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
2990 - Ord Return of Jury Fees Transaction 4481573 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-18-2014:09:41:36 |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4481578 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-18-2014:09:42:36 |
|
May 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
1356 - Certificate of Mailing Extra Text: |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
2490 - Motion ... PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO HAVE DEPOSITED JURY TRIAL MONEY RETURNED TO PLAINTIFF |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
4145 - Supreme Court Remittitur SUPREME COURT CASE NUMBER: 60488 / REMITTITUR - Transaction 4371841 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-03-2014:11:32:05 |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4371847 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-03-2014:11:33:09 |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
4111 - Supreme Ct Clk's Cert & Judg SUPREME COURT CASE NUMBER: 60488 / SUPREME COURT CLERKS CERTIFICATE AND JUDGMENT - Transaction 4371841 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-03-2014:11:32:05 |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
4134 - Supreme Court Order Affirming SUPREME COURT CASE NUMBER: 60488 / ORDER OF AFFIRMANCE - Transaction 4371841 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-03-2014:11:32:05 |
|
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
4134 - Supreme Court Order Affirming SUPREME COURT NO. 60488/ORDER OF AFFIRMANCE - Transaction 4197113 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-13-2013:10:25:24 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.