Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dba X-Treme Transmission And Automotive, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Vazquez, Jose A., in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Barry L. Breslow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarry L. Breslow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2006 |
CategoryCa - Appeal From Lower Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
F105 - Transferred Extra Text: |
|
April 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
1775 - General Receipt Extra Text: |
|
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
CHECK - **Trust Disbursement A Disbursement of $250.00 on Check Number 16391 |
|
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
July 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... Order ruling in favor of the Appellant on Appeal |
|
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: APPEAL PARTY SUBMITTING: JESUS RUIZ DATE SUBMITTED: 7/10/07 SUBMITTED BY: JB DATE RECEIVED JUDGE'S OFFICE: |
|
July 10, 2007 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 07/20/2007 Extra Text: Judge: BARRY BRESLOW |
|
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
3060 - Ord Granting Mtn ... Order Granting Motion to Vacate Order for Dismissal of Appeal |
|
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
1325 - ** Case Reopened Extra Text: |
|
May 10, 2007 | Docket Event |
2880 - Ord for Briefing Schedule Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.