Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nevada Dept. Of Corrections,, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Lightsey, Rod, in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Lynne K. Simons presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLynne K. Simons Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2006 |
CategoryAo - Other Judicial Review/Appeal |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
F105 - Transferred ROBERT W. LINDER, ESQ., DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, 555 E. WASHINGTON AVE., ROOM 3900, LAS VEGAS, NV. 89101 |
|
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... DECISION OF HEARING OFFICER AFFIRMED |
|
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
1315 - ** Case Closed Extra Text: |
|
August 23, 2007 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 09/06/2007 Extra Text: order Judge: LYNNE SIMONS |
|
August 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission DOCUMENT TITLE: PETITIONER'S OPENING BRIEF, RESPONDENT'S ANSWERING BRIEF, AND PETITIONER'S REPY BRIEF PARTY SUBMITTING: ROBERT W. LINDER, ESQ. DATE SUBMITTED: 8/23/07 SUBMITTED BY: SDAVIS DATE RECEIVED JUDGE'S OFFICE: |
|
May 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
3785 - Reply Brief PETITIONER'S |
|
May 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
2645 - Opposition to Mtn ... OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
2640 - Opening Brief PETITIONER'S |
|
March 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Extra Text: |
|
March 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
3030 - Ord Granting Extension Time Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.