Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Erdesz, Julianna, Erdesz, Ildiko, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Gomez, Kozar, Mcelreath And Smith Professional Corportation,, Washoe Medical Center, Inc.,, Hulka, M.D., Frieda M., in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Connie J. Steinheimer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryMd - Medical/Dental |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2008 | Hearing |
H852 - TRIAL - JURY D845 - Vacated filed on: 07/17/2008 Extra Text: Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord ORDER FOR DISMISSAL |
|
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
MSEAL - **Sealed Minutes SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - 6/25/08 Transaction 332641 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-20-2008:15:09:51 |
|
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
CHECK - **Trust Disbursement A Disbursement of $500.00 on Check Number 15679 |
|
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
CHECK - **Trust Disbursement A Disbursement of $320.00 on Check Number 15685 |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
2910 - Ord Dismissal w/Prejudice AS TO DEFENDANT WASHOE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., RETURN OF JURY FEES DEPOSITED ON BEHALF OF WASHOE MEDICAL CENTER, INC. |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
F120 - Stipulated Dismissal Extra Text: |
|
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
4050 - Stipulation ... STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
CHECK - **Trust Disbursement A Disbursement of $320.00 on Check Number 15620 |
|
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
3990 - Stip & Ord Dismiss W/Prejudice Extra Text: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.