Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cavalry Portfolio Services, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Person, Phillip J., in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with WALKER, EGAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
CategoryCt - Collection Of Actions |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
1067 - Affidavit of Service AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED - Transaction 4104818 - Approved By: ACROGHAN : 10-31-2013:12:04:45 |
|
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 4105293 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-31-2013:12:06:49 |
|
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
1030 - Affidavit in Support... OF RENEWAL OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
3897 - Return Extra Text: |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
1685 - Execution Filed Extra Text: |
|
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
1690 - ** Execution issued Extra Text: |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
2535 - Notice of Entry of Judgment Extra Text: |
|
November 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
1555 - Default Judgment DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST PHILLIP J. PERSON PRINCIPAL: $12,786.14 COSTS: $197.00 ATTY FEES: $740.00 INTEREST: $5,797.37 WITH INTEREST ON PRINCIPAL AT THE LEGAL RATE PER ANNUM |
|
September 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
1120 - Amended ... AMENDED AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES |
|
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
1030 - Affidavit in Support... AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO D-7 9/7/07 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.