Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategorySe - Set Aside |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
3240 - Ord Set Aside Est w/o Admin ORDER TO SET ASIDE ESTATE WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION - Transaction 8640219 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-10-2021:11:11:50 |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8640238 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-10-2021:11:13:26 |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
F140 - Adj Summary Judgment Extra Text: |
|
September 08, 2021 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN D425 - Granted filed on: 09/08/2021 Extra Text: JAVS/ZOOM/LSCURLOCK 9/8/2021: Petition to Set Aside without Administration. Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
4295 - Will 9/8/2021: Petition to Set Aside without Administration. - Transaction 8635688 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-08-2021:13:58:33 |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8635692 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-08-2021:13:59:15 |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 9/8/2021: Petition to Set Aside without Administration. - Transaction 8635687 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-08-2021:13:58:16 |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8635696 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-08-2021:13:59:27 |
|
September 08, 2021 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8619026 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-27-2021:16:23:34 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.