Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with SHANNON, MASTER GREG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHANNON, MASTER GREG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedJune 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2021 | Hearing |
H353 - FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: MASTER SHANNON |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8473144 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-01-2021:16:51:58 |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... NOTICE OF PROPOSED EXHIBITS - Transaction 8473001 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 06-01-2021:16:50:55 |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
1356 - Certificate of Mailing Transaction 8464812 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-26-2021:11:39:55 |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8464816 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-26-2021:11:40:57 |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
1356 - Certificate of Mailing Transaction 8463046 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-25-2021:14:33:48 |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8463054 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-25-2021:14:34:53 |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing 6/8/21 1020 Transaction 8436895 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-10-2021:15:31:56 |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8436899 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-10-2021:15:32:51 |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
3720 - Proof of Service Transaction 8432113 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-06-2021:15:26:51 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.