Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Barry L. Breslow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarry L. Breslow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryPs - Petition To Seal Records |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2021 | Hearing |
H384 - HEARING ON PETITION - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: BARRY BRESLOW |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
3242 - Ord Setting Hearing Transaction 8603606 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-19-2021:07:08:29 |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8603608 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-19-2021:07:09:19 |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8601503 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-18-2021:10:27:18 |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of $255.00 was made on receipt DCDC678553. |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... NOTICE OF FILING PETITION TO SEAL RECORDS - Transaction 8601491 - Approved By: BBLOUGH : 08-18-2021:10:25:38 |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
3845 - Request for Hearing Transaction 8601494 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-18-2021:10:24:20 DOCUMENT TITLE: PETITION TO SEAL CRIMINAL RECORDS PARTY SUBMITTING: MATHEW HIGBEE, ESQ DATE SUBMITTED: 08/18/2021 SUBMITTED BY: SJA DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
$2441 - $Pet to Seal Criminal Records Petition to Seal - Transaction 8601250 - Approved By: BBLOUGH : 08-18-2021:10:12:54 |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8601497 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-18-2021:10:27:00 |
|
August 18, 2021 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 08/19/2021 Extra Text: Judge: BARRY BRESLOW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.