Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Marquis Plaza Regency, Williams, Tamika Manaye, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Denise L. Gentile presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2024 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation to Appear and Show Cause
Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Decision
Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion Doc ID# 13 [13] Ex-Parte Motion to Reset the Hearing of Marquis Plaza Regency's Petition for Appointment of Clark County Public Guardian as a General Guardian of the Person and Estate and for Issuance of Letters of Guardianship |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Physicians Certificate Doc ID# 10 [10] Confidential Medical / Educational Documents - Physician's Certificate |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Electronically Issued/Filed Doc ID# 12 [12] Citation to Appear and Show Cause |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Receipt Doc ID# 9 [9] Receipt of Legal Documents |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Sheet - Guardianship Doc ID# 11 [11] Confidential Information Sheet - Guardianship |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of General Guardian Doc ID# 8 [8] Petition for Appointment of Clark County Public Guardian as a General Guardian of the Person and Estate and for Issuance of Letters of Guardianship |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 7 [7] Notice of Entry of Order re: Order Appointing Counsel and Directing Medical and Financial Records and Information |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.