Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gurganus, Jose filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Linda Marquis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLinda Marquis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 12, 2007 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department B Judicial Reassignment - From Judge Vincent Ochoa to Judge Linda Marquis |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department S Case reassigned from Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel Dept G |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case USJR- GUARDIANSHIP STATISTICAL CASE STATUS |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Re-Notice of Hearing |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Status Check
Judge: O'Malley, Gloria |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Administrative Reassignment to Department G | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.