Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Galambas, Jeffrey James, filed a(n) Miscellaneous Complaint case represented by Danielle Dawson, against Robinson, Staci Lynn, represented by Jennifer Setters, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Denise L. Gentile presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2024 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Complaint |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference
Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Seal Records Defendant's Motion to Seal Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendants Motion for Temporary Spousal Support, Waste Claim and Attorney's Fees, for Exclusive Possession of the Residence, and Other Related Relief Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Financial Disclosure Form Doc ID# 23 [23] Financial Disclosure Form |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Temporary Orders and Countermotion Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Doc ID# 22 [22] Defendant's Supplemental Exhibits to Defendant's Motion for Temporary Spousal Support, Waste Claim and Attorney's Fees, For Exclusive Possession of the Residence, and Other Related Relief |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 21 [21] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 20 [20] Stipulation and Order to Continue |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Doc ID# 19 [19] Substitution of Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.